MD SJ2 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that affirms every citizen's individual right to vote, reserves inalienable political rights to natural persons, and authorizes regulation of campaign contributions and electioneering expenditures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-49) (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-18) (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {333227/2 Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {273720/1 Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {973420/1 Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13SenateSenators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling
2015-04-13SenateConference Committee Appointed
2015-04-13SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2015-04-13SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (89-49)
2015-04-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {163329/1 Report Adopted
2015-04-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2015-04-10HouseHearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2015-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (29-18)
2015-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {333227/2 Rejected (18-29)
2015-04-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {273720/1 Rejected (18-29)
2015-04-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Hough) {973420/1 Rejected (18-29)
2015-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted (33-14)
2015-04-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2015-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {464132/1
2015-04-06SenateSpecial Order until 4/7 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2015-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {464132/1
2015-04-03SenateLaid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2015-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {464132/1
2015-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-02-26SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sj0002&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sj/sj0002f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sj/sj0002t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0002/sj0002_46413201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0002/sj0002_27372001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0002/sj0002_33322702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0002/sj0002_97342001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0002/sj0002_16332901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sj0002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sj0002_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sj0002_exn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sj0002,s-0792&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sj0002,s-0793&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sj0002,s-0794&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sj0002,s-0795&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sj0002,s-0803&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sj0002,h-1101&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback