MD SJ1 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the fundamental requirements for United 2026 as laid out in FIFA's "Proposal for a United Human Rights Strategy"; and encouraging all host stadiums, cities, ports of entry, and fan zones to provide certain atmospheres, experiences, and policies for fans, spectators, players, officials, and volunteers at the 2026 FIFA World Cup.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 109 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Floor Amendment 853021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Joint Resolution 1
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (110-21)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (109-18)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2020-02-27HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2020-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2020-02-24SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-24SenateFloor Amendment {433729/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2020-02-21SenateMotion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2020-02-21SenateFloor Amendment {853021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
2020-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {248972/1 Adopted
2020-02-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-29SenateHearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-01-27SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HJ7 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SJ0001?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sj/sj0001f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sj/sj0001t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0001/sj0001_24897201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0001/sj0001_85302101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0001/sj0001_43372901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sj0001_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sj0001_hru.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0331.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0384.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1252.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1253.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback