MD SB997 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacist to substitute an interchangeable biological product for the prescribed product under specified circumstances; requiring a pharmacist or the pharmacist's designee, except under specified circumstances, to inform specified consumers of the availability of an interchangeable biological product and the approximate cost difference as compared to a specified drug; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy to maintain on its Web site a link to a specified list of biological products; etc.
Title
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological Products
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Identification
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Public Information
Communications
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Identification
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Public Information