MD SB997 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County under specified circumstances to extend an alcoholic beverages license for not more than 2 years if the licensed premises is forced to close because of a casualty loss; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Expiration of Licenses - Extension for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-04-09 | Hearing 4/11 at 9:30 a.m. | |
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-04-03 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-30 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-24 | Referred Senate Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Circuit Courts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Circuit Courts
License Commissioners, Boards of