MD SB996 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a subtraction modification under the State income tax for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least 55 years old from $10,000 to $15,000; providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under certain circumstances for the first $15,000 of retirement income attributable to employment as a correctional officer; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income (Hometown Heroes and Veterans Act of 2018)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment {213220/1 (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {445863/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {109630/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Elderly Persons
Exemptions
Income Tax
Juvenile Facilities
Retirement Systems
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Correctional Officers
Elderly Persons
Exemptions
Income Tax
Juvenile Facilities
Retirement Systems
Taxes - Income
Veterans