MD SB996 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "abuse" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes to include the physical or mental injury of a child by a person who, because of the person's position or occupation, exercises authority over the child under specified circumstances; providing that "abuse" does not include the physical injury of a child by accidental means; altering the definition of "mental injury" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes; etc.
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Care
Child Custody
Family Law
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Sexual Offenses
Child Care
Child Custody
Family Law
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Sexual Offenses