MD SB994 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (106-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the composition, powers, and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the State Board of Electricians; establishing a low-voltage electrician license as a State license to be awarded to qualifying electricians; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt regulations to establish the education requirements and qualifications for a State apprentice electrician license and a State-registered apprentice electrician license; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 16 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 115 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (106-16)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (115-14)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-13HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {864232/1 Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1127 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Occupations and Professions6101(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6102(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6103(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6104(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6201(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6202(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6205(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6301(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6302(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6303(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6304(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6305(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6306(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6306.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6307(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6307.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6308(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6310(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6311(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6312(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6315(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6316(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6319(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6321(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6401(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6601(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6602(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6603(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6604(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6605(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6606(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6607(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6608(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions6701(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback