MD SB991 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Farmers; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to assist in the repayment of a higher education loan obtained for tuition, education expenses, or living expenses for undergraduate or graduate study leading to a degree in agriculture or an agriculture-related field, including farming; requiring the Office, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture, to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {485160/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0991&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0991f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0991t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0991e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_405_sb0991e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0991_48516001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0991.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0991_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0636.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0991_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1399.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1388.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback