MD SB99 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, and managed care organizations to indicate in a certain manner on a health insurance benefit card or prescription benefit card or other technology which State agency regulates the policy or contract offered by the entity; applying the Act to all policies or contracts issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Benefit Cards, Prescription Benefit Cards, and Other Technology - Identification of Regulatory Agency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-02-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {907073/1 Adopted
2020-02-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-12-19SenateHearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-09-16SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance15130(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15130.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback