MD SB99 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding certain counties to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from certain building performance standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in certain counties from a building permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {373527/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714630/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714630/1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore County
Building Permits
Counties - Local Laws
Kent County
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Safety
St. Mary's County
Tourism
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore County
Building Permits
Counties - Local Laws
Kent County
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Safety
St. Mary's County
Tourism