MD SB979 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that records related to a formal complaint of job-related misconduct made against a public employee do not constitute personnel records under the Public Information Act; and authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records of an investigation, a hearing, or a decision by a governmental unit connected with a complaint of job-related misconduct made against a public employee.
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Data
Investigations and Inquiries
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor and Employment
Data
Investigations and Inquiries
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor and Employment