MD SB979 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that records related to a formal complaint of job-related misconduct made against a public employee do not constitute personnel records under the Public Information Act; and authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records of an investigation, a hearing, or a decision by a governmental unit connected with a complaint of job-related misconduct made against a public employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2019-03-11SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback