MD SB971 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission, in consultation with the Anne Arundel County Police Academy, to develop and maintain a uniform statewide training curriculum that includes role-playing exercises to ensure the use of best practices in issuance of citations in lieu of arrest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-02-25SenateHearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback