MD SB970 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of certain fees and fines that may be imposed by the State Ethics Commission for certain purposes; altering a certain requirement for a certain official to disclose the acceptance of certain tickets or free admission to certain events on a financial disclosure statement; requiring each member of the General Assembly to submit a certain annual notice regarding a certain meeting with the Ethics Counsel to the presiding officers of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {354135/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |