MD SB97 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a person may not be denied the right to purchase, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the person is authorized to use medical cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms - Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry - Use of Medical Cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {558271/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback