MD SB97 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the Prince George's County AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program; authorizing the establishment of Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs; requiring a local health department or a specified community-based organization to apply to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and a local health officer for authorization to operate a Program; requiring the Department and a local health officer to approve or deny an application within 60 days of receiving a completed application; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-40) (Y: 96 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (B. Wilson) {923326/1 Rejected (56-77) (Y: 56 N: 77 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (B. Wilson) {723123/1 Rejected (49-84) (Y: 49 N: 84 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348
2016-04-11SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (96-40)
2016-04-09HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {923326/1 Rejected (56-77)
2016-04-09HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {723123/1 Rejected (49-84)
2016-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2016-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-17HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2016-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (41-6)
2016-02-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {397876/1 Report Adopted
2016-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2016-01-28SenateHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2015-10-06SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0097&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0097f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0097t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_348_sb0097t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0097_39787601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0097_72312301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0097_92332601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0097.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0097_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0097_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0097,s-0227&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0097,h-1287&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0097,h-1288&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0097,h-1289&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback