MD SB968 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale and display of certain imitation firearms in Baltimore City; and providing that a certain violation is a civil offense subject to a fine of $500 for the first offense and $1,500 for each subsequent offense.
Title
Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1160 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 4 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |