MD SB968 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing specified fees for applicants for a home builder registration and a home builder sales representative registration; increasing the administrative fee for the Home Builder Guaranty Fund for specified home builders; increasing the fee for renewal of a specified registration or registration certificate; and adding a renewal of registration fee based on a specified number of specified building permits issued to a specified registrant.
Title
Business Regulation - Home Builder Registration - Fees
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (86-51) (Y: 86 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (86-51) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {107079/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |