MD SB960 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Transportation from acquiring a right-of-way or exercising eminent domain, and prohibiting a person from acquiring a right-of-way, for a highway project that encroaches on or adversely affects certain cultural and historic sites and properties unless the General Assembly approves the development of the project by a majority vote in each of the two Houses.
Title
Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1373 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Cemeteries
Condemnation
Construction
Federal Government
Grants
Highways
Historical Matters
Privatization
State Government - Procurement
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Boundaries
Cemeteries
Condemnation
Construction
Federal Government
Grants
Highways
Historical Matters
Privatization
State Government - Procurement
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0960?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0960f.pdf |