MD SB960 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Historical Trust to notify a certain applicant of the decision of the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust on an application for the change or alteration of a property subject to a certain historic preservation easement on or before the earlier of the expiration of a certain time period specified in the easement documentation or 90 days after the date the application or any supplement to an application is submitted to the Trust; and defining "general repair and maintenance".
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {450216/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {724131/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Easements
Historical Matters
Notices
Real Property
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Historical Matters
Notices
Real Property
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time