MD SB960 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a State property tax exemption for property that is actively used for farm or agricultural purposes and is subject to an easement or other interest that is conveyed or assigned to specified entities; and applying the Act to tax years beginning after June 30, 2010.
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Farm or Agricultural Property Subject to an Easement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0960.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0960f.pdf |