MD SB958 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB149
Note: Carry Over of previous SB843
Note: Carry Over of previous SB843
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation Payment Program in the Department of the Environment to secure payments from certain businesses that extract fossil fuels or refine petroleum products in order to provide a source of revenue for State efforts to adapt to and mitigate the effects of climate change and to address the health impacts of climate change on vulnerable populations; establishing the Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation Fund to support efforts to mitigate the effects of climate change; etc.
Title
Responding to Emergency Needs From Extreme Weather (RENEW) Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB958 (Carry Over) 2024-02-07 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
SB843 (Carry Over) 2023-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
HB1438 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
SB843 (Carry Over) 2023-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
HB1438 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Subjects
Air Pollution
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Bicycles
Budgets
Civil Actions
Coal
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Debt Management
Electric Motor Vehicles
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Fuel
Grants
Health - Insurance
Hearings
Housing
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Liability
Low-Income
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Shore Erosion
Transportation
Treasurers
Wastewater
Weather
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Bicycles
Budgets
Civil Actions
Coal
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Debt Management
Electric Motor Vehicles
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Fuel
Grants
Health - Insurance
Hearings
Housing
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Liability
Low-Income
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Shore Erosion
Transportation
Treasurers
Wastewater
Weather
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 110.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 110.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0958?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0958f.pdf |