MD SB958 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of qualified energy resources under a specified credit against the State income tax for specified electricity produced from specified qualified resources to eliminate the restriction that nonhazardous waste material be in either solid or cellulosic form; etc.
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act - Qualified Energy Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-04-08 | Hearing 4/8 at 9:00 a.m. | |
2011-04-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2011-03-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading Senate Rules |