MD SB950 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 833
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 833
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the reimbursement of a sexual assault forensic exam conducted through peer-to-peer telehealth under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee to conduct a study on the feasibility of a telehealth program that includes a pilot program for conducting sexual assault forensic examinations through telehealth; and requiring the Committee to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024.
Title
Sexual Assault Forensic Examinations Conducted Through Telehealth - Reimbursement and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 833 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823725/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1127 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 832
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedures
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Pilot Programs
Reimbursement Rates
Remote Access
Reports
Sexual Offenses
studies
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Criminal Law - Procedures
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Pilot Programs
Reimbursement Rates
Remote Access
Reports
Sexual Offenses
studies
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |