MD SB950 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a holder of a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license in Wicomico County to sell alcohol on Sundays.
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses – Hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Retail Sales
Time
Wicomico County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Retail Sales
Time
Wicomico County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0950?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0950f.pdf |