MD SB95 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Obligating public adjusters to disburse insurance settlement payments received on behalf of the insured within 15 business days after the date of the payment from an insurer.
Title
Public Adjusters - Disbursement of Insurance Settlement Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867475/1 Adopted |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Consumer Protection
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Public Officials
Time
Claims
Consumer Protection
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Public Officials
Time