MD SB95 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain meetings of a council of unit owners of a condominium or a homeowners association to be held on less than 30 days of notice; requiring certain meeting notices for condominiums and homeowners associations to include a copy of the proposed agenda for the meeting; prohibiting certain receivers from voting on behalf of certain condominium unit owners or homeowners association lot owners; etc.
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Condominiums
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Records
Time
Voting
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Records
Time
Voting