MD SB949 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement at a specified time if the person was convicted of possession of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-48) (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-43) (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
2017-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-04-10SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (91-48)
2017-04-10HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2017-04-10SenateSenators Smith, Muse, and Ready
2017-04-10SenateConference Committee Appointed
2017-04-10SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2017-04-07HouseDelegates Atterbeary, J. Lewis, and Rey
2017-04-07HouseConference Committee Appointed
2017-04-07HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2017-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2017-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (94-43)
2017-03-31HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments {632419/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2017-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {208977/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-02SenateHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0949&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0949f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0949t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0949e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_801_sb0949e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0949_20897701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0949_63241901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0949_29382901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0949_16372001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0949.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0949_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0949_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0949_16372001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0949,s-0563&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0949,h-1149&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0949,s-1499&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0949,h-1523&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback