MD SB94 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a specified provision of law requiring that specified displaced homemakers be exempt from payment of specified tuition and be counted in a specified computation of full-time equivalent enrollment; replacing obsolete references with references to the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act; stating the intent of the General Assembly that specified regulations be developed giving attention to training for individuals involved in the transition to the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act; etc.
Title
Workforce Development - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {327170/1 Report Adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Displaced Homemakers
Education
Federal Government
Foster Care
Higher Education
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Names
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Unemployment
Vocational Rehabilitation
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Annotated Code of Maryland
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Displaced Homemakers
Education
Federal Government
Foster Care
Higher Education
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Names
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Unemployment
Vocational Rehabilitation
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth