MD SB94 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the authority of specified governmental units to adopt a fee structure to cover specified costs for system services; altering a specified definition for the purpose of repealing the authority of specified governmental units to adopt a fee structure to cover specified costs relating to existing system products; authorizing specified governmental units to adopt a fee structure for system products that includes an additional charge of not more than $50; repealing a specified requirement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149
2015-04-03SenatePassed Enrolled
2015-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2015-04-03SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2015-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2015-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {736781/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2015-03-25HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2015-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-02-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted
2015-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-02-11SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-01-26SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0094&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0094f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0094t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0094e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_149_sb0094e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0094_51403901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0094_73678101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0094.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0094_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0094_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0094,s-0188&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0094,h-0705&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0094,s-0735&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback