MD SB938 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Redesignating electronic voter registration agencies as automatic voter registration agencies; requiring automatic voter registration agencies to inform an applicant completing an applicable transaction that the applicant shall be registered to vote or shall have a voter registration record updated unless the applicant declines to register to vote or update a voter registration record or is determined not to be eligible to register to vote; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Automatic Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-14SenateHearing canceled
2017-03-02SenateHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback