MD SB934 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an individual to apply to become a registered voter at the public or private high school where the individual is employed or enrolled; requiring the State Board of Elections to designate public and private high schools as voter registration entities; requiring certain high schools to designate faculty or staff members to distribute, at least twice a year, a voter registration application to employees and certain students who are or will be 16 years old or older during the year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Voter Registration - High Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-28SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback