MD SB933 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland 529 Board to develop an application form for a certain State contribution program that includes certain information; requiring the Governor to provide appropriations of $5,000,000 in fiscal year 2018 and $3,000,000 in fiscal year 2019 and each fiscal year thereafter; altering the name of the Maryland College Investment Plan and Prepaid College Trust to include a reference to Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer; altering the date by which the Board is required to develop and implement an outreach and marketing plan; etc.
Title
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {654069/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {779135/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Comptroller
Contracts
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Income Tax
Investments
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Tax Credits
Time
Tuition
Appropriations
Comptroller
Contracts
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Income Tax
Investments
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Tax Credits
Time
Tuition