MD SB933 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to alter the deadline for the Board of Directors of the Mary Harvin Transformation Center Development Corporation, Inc. in Baltimore City to present evidence of a specified matching fund; providing that a specified grant may not terminate before June 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Baltimore City - Mary Harvin Transformation Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |