MD SB932 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from carrying a deadly weapon on the property of an institution of higher education; providing specified exceptions to the prohibition; establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $1,000 or both; establishing that a person convicted of violating the Act by carrying or possessing a handgun shall be sentenced under specified provisions of law; and defining "institution of higher education".
Title
Criminal Law - Deadly Weapons on the Property of an Institution of Higher Education
Sponsors
Sen. James Robey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Higher Education
Penalties and Sentences
Weapons
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Higher Education
Penalties and Sentences
Weapons