MD SB932 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Special Event (SE) beer, wine and liquor license in Calvert County; specifying that the license entitles the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for consumption on the licensed premises; requiring that an applicant for the license first obtain approval of the Board for specified items; specifying that the license may be valid for 1 or more days; authorizing the Board to approve multiple venues where alcoholic beverages may be sold on the licensed premises; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-02 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-24 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Safety