MD SB930 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County, on or before June 30, 2020, to enter into an agreement with the owner of a specified economic development project that provides a specified economic benefit for a payment in lieu of the county real and personal property tax; authorizing the owner of the economic development project and the county to modify the payment in lieu of taxes agreement entered into on or before June 30, 2020, under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {459835/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |