MD SB93 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Maryland Workforce Corporation and the Health Care Personnel Training Fund; repealing specified provisions of law related to the board of directors, officers, and employees of the Corporation; repealing specified provisions of law related to the authority and duties of the Corporation; requiring that all net assets of the Corporation revert to the State for a public purpose; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to receive and dispose of the assets, if any, on behalf of the State; etc.
Title
Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Health Occupations
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Health Occupations
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials