MD SB93 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Recreational Incentives Pilot Program in the Department of Natural Resources; stating that the purpose of the pilot program is to determine whether incentive discounts offered to specified individuals increase the purchase of recreational hunting and fishing licenses; requiring the Department to develop a plan to implement the pilot program, subject to requirements and restrictions; requiring the Department to implement the pilot program in accordance with the developed plan; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset