MD SB93 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2017, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; altering the membership of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2016; and requiring the Board to make a specified report on or before October 1, 2011.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/1 at 3:45 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | Re-assigned Finance | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |