MD SB928 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
On or after October 1, 2021, prohibiting the Department of the Environment from approving coverage under a concentrated animal feeding operation (CAFO) Discharge permit for a certain CAFO, unless the permit applicant submits a certain manure transport plan to the Department as part of the permit application; etc.
Title
Environment – Concentrated Animal Feeding Operation Construction or Expansion – Manure Transport Plan Requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Construction
Environment, Department of the
Licenses
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Transportation
Animals
Construction
Environment, Department of the
Licenses
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 326.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |