MD SB928 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters relating to changes in the nursing profession that have resulted in a shortage of nurses in the State and nation; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {984633/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Hospitals
Nurses
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Community Colleges
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Hospitals
Nurses
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment