MD SB928 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an insurance producer who is licensed to sell health insurance to charge reasonable fees for an administrative service that is sold by the insurance producer to an employer; providing that fees may not be charged by an insurance producer for specified services; requiring an insurance producer, before a fee for administrative services is charged, to disclose specified information; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Fees for Administrative Services Provided by Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (118-4) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-04 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-04 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments 147072/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Disclosure
Fees
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance Administration
Records
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Work, Labor and Employment
Disclosure
Fees
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance Administration
Records
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Work, Labor and Employment