MD SB926 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class CCFA (continuing care facility for the aged) beer, wine and liquor license in Harford County; specifying that the Liquor Control Board may issue a Class CCFA license to an organization that provides specified care, is licensed as a specified institution, is certified by a specified department, is exempt from federal income tax, and is located in Harford County; providing that specified prohibitions do not apply to the Act; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for Aged -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (132-2) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-20 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-02 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-23 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Continuing Care
Elderly Persons
Fees
Harford County
Health Care Facilities
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Continuing Care
Elderly Persons
Fees
Harford County
Health Care Facilities
License Commissioners, Boards of