MD SB925 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, subject to specified provisions of law, a person has specified rights and is subject to specified restrictions applicable to pedestrians while the person is lawfully operating a bicycle, play vehicle, or unicycle on a sidewalk or sidewalk area or in or through a crosswalk; providing that, at an intersection, a person operating a bicycle, play vehicle, or unicycle is subject to specified traffic control signals; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in Crosswalks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487072/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |