MD SB925 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding a specified property tax credit for specified business entities in Washington County to include specified business entities that invest at least $10,000,000 for capital improvements of specified real property and create 100 new and permanent full-time positions in Washington County; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credit; making conforming changes; and providing for the application of the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-11 | House | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2015-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Construction
Corporations
Investments
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Construction
Corporations
Investments
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment