MD SB925 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding to residential property specified authority of the governing body of Carroll County to grant, by law, a green building tax credit against the county property tax imposed on specified properties on which a person installs specified environmentally friendly technologies; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2010; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Green Building Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Conservation
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Housing
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Conservation
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Housing
Property Tax
Tax Credits