MD SB922 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, on or before December 1, 2016, goals for percentages of high school graduates; requiring, on or before December 1, 2016, the State Board to develop a method to consider a student's attainment of a specified credential or completion of a specified apprenticeship program as equivalent to a specified Advanced Placement examination score for a specified purpose; requiring the Division of Workforce Development to identify opportunities to create registered apprenticeship programs; etc.
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-04-11 | House | Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m. |
2016-04-09 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937577/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Apprentices
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Education
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Education
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment