MD SB921 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from solar energy for specified years; altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 1 renewable sources for specified years; authorizing the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to receive money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to study the workforce development training needs for the clean energy industry in the State; etc.
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-48) (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22) (Y: 22 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22) (Y: 22 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-48) |
2016-04-11 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate McConkey) Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2016-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {133822/1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {393723/1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {413320/1 Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Contracts
Credit
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Grants
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Tax Credits
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Welfare
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Alternative Energy Sources
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Contracts
Credit
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Grants
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Tax Credits
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Welfare
Women
Work, Labor and Employment