MD SB921 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Nursing by extending to July 1, 2023, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2022; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Department of Budget and Management, to contract with an independent entity for a specified management and personnel study with costs paid from the Board of Nursing Fund; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 686081/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 464538/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset